Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/13/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/03/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/10/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/02/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/13/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/09/2008