Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 10/29/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/29/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 10/29/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/29/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/29/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/29/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/29/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 10/29/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/29/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/06/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 11/08/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/08/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/14/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/14/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/15/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 11/15/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/11/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/11/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 12/18/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 12/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/04/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/04/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/06/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/11/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/11/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/08/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/08/2008