Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 11/01/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/18/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/15/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/29/2008