Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/31/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/31/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/13/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/04/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/28/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/28/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/04/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/15/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/21/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/05/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/24/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/24/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/22/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/22/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/22/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/19/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew