Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 12/13/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/18/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/17/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/17/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/17/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/17/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/28/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/07/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/07/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/13/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/13/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/13/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/13/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/13/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/14/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/06/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/08/2008