Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/17/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/17/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/15/2008