Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/12/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/17/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/18/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/18/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 01/18/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/29/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/15/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/27/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/05/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/13/2008