Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/23/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/30/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/19/2007