Refine your search

Showing 13 of 13 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
08/14/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-314.
08/14/2008 Signed by President.
08/06/2008 Presented to President.
07/31/2008 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 89 - 3. Record Vote Number: 193.(consideration: CR S7878)
07/30/2008 Conference report agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 1 (Roll no. 543).
07/29/2008 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 110-787 filed.(text of conference report: CR H7194-7214)
07/17/2008 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
06/25/2008 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
04/29/2008 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Inouye; Pryor; Boxer; Klobuchar; Stevens; Hutchison; Sununu.(consideration: CR S3549)
03/06/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S.2663 with an amendment by Yea-Nay. 79 - 13. Record Vote Number: 41.(text: CR 3/7/2008 S1768-1781)
12/19/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 1185).(text: CR H16874-16880)
12/19/2007 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 110-501.
11/01/2007 Introduced in House