Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/01/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 11/01/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/08/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/08/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/13/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/13/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/13/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/15/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/04/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 12/04/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/11/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/11/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/11/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/11/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 12/12/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/12/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 12/12/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/12/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/12/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 12/12/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/12/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/12/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/13/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 12/19/2007