Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/01/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/06/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/23/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/23/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/11/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/12/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/12/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 03/13/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/01/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/01/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/01/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/15/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/24/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/18/2008