There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow employees of a commercial passenger airline carrier who receive payments in a bankruptcy proceeding to roll over such payments into an individual retirement plan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/01/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/07/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2341)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2007Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/18/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/19/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/28/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/28/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/07/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/13/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/26/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/27/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/04/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/04/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/13/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/15/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/29/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/07/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/04/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/17/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/26/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/01/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4061. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/01/2007)

Allows employees of commercial passenger airlines who receive payments from a bankruptcy case filed between September 11, 2001, and January 1, 2007, as compensation for lost pension plan benefits to rollover such payments into an individual retirement account (IRA), except for a Roth IRA, without tax or tax penalty.