Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/04/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/12/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/18/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/13/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/21/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/24/2008