Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/10/2008