There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Bridges from Jobs to Careers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide grants to colleges to improve remedial education (including English language instruction), to customize remediation to student career goals, and to help students move rapidly from remediation into for-credit occupation program courses and through program completion.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/01/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/15/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
11/01/2007Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/08/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor11/01/2007 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness01/15/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4067.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4067. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/01/2007)

Bridges from Jobs to Careers Act - Directs the Secretary of Education to award competitive grants to institutions of higher education (IHEs) to improve remedial education, customize remediation to student career goals, and help remedial students progress into and through for-credit occupational programs.

Gives grant priority to IHEs: (1) in which at least 50% of the first-year students are enrolled in remedial courses designed to give them collegiate reading, writing, or mathematics skills; and (2) that propose to collaborate with adult education providers and replicate practices that have proven effective with adults.