Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/07/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/07/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 11/07/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/13/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/23/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/28/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/01/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/08/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/24/2008