There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent certain temporary provisions applicable to individuals, including the sales tax deduction, the child credit, the repeal of the estate tax, and the deduction for higher education expenses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/11/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/11/2007Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/11/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/19/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/19/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/19/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/19/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/19/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/24/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/31/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/31/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/31/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/31/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/31/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/31/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/31/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/31/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/07/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/07/2007
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/07/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/07/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/07/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/07/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/07/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/07/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/05/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/05/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/22/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/08/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/11/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.411. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2007)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the tax deductions for state and local sales taxes, for certain expenses of elementary and secondary school teachers, and for tuition and related expenses.

Exempts certain provisions of the Economic Growth and Tax Relief Reconciliation Act of 2001 relating to the child tax credit, marriage penalty relief, repeal of the estate tax, and the tax deduction for higher education expenses from the general terminating date of that Act (i.e., December 31, 2010).