Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/19/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/19/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/19/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/19/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/19/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/24/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/31/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/31/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/31/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/31/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/31/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/31/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/31/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/31/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/07/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/07/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/07/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/07/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/07/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/07/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/07/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/07/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/05/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/05/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/22/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/08/2008