Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/05/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/15/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/26/2008