Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/08/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 11/08/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/08/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/08/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/13/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/14/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/14/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/05/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/10/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/10/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/13/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/11/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/08/2008