Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/08/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/05/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 12/05/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/15/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/15/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/06/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/05/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/12/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/10/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/08/2008