There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate a portion of California State Route 91 located in Los Angeles County, California, as the "Juanita Millender-McDonald Highway".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/21/2008Became Public Law No: 110-441. (TXT | PDF)
10/21/2008Signed by President.
10/10/2008Presented to President.
10/02/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10421)
09/29/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/27/2008 H10142)
09/27/2008Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-895.
11/09/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/21/2008Became Public Law No: 110-441. (TXT | PDF)
10/21/2008Signed by President.
10/10/2008HousePresented to President.
10/03/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/02/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10421)
09/30/2008SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/29/2008-2:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2008-2:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/27/2008 H10142)
09/29/2008-2:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10631)
09/27/2008-11:13amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Duncan objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/27/2008-10:52amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4131.
09/27/2008-10:52amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10142-10145)
09/27/2008-10:52amHouseMs. Richardson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/27/2008HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 282.
09/27/2008HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-895.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/31/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/31/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/31/2008HouseSubcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/13/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/09/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
11/09/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/09/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 11/09/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/12/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/12/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/12/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/12/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/12/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/31/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/31/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/09/2007 Referred to
07/31/2008 Markup by
09/27/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-895
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit11/13/2007 Referred to
07/31/2008 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4131.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4131. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-441 (10/02/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the portion of California State Route 91 located in Los Angeles County, California, from post mile 10.4 to post mile 11.1 as the "Juanita Millender-McDonald Highway."