Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/09/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/14/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/01/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/03/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/10/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/09/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/17/2008