Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 11/13/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/13/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 11/13/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/14/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/14/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/15/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 12/13/2007