Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 11/14/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/06/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/19/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/10/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/29/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/29/2008