Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 11/14/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 11/14/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 12/06/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/11/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/11/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/11/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 12/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 12/13/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/27/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/27/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/27/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/27/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/05/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/05/2008