Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/14/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/10/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/12/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/17/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/15/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/15/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/23/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/13/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/15/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/15/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/07/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/19/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/04/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/04/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/29/2008