There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Wright Brothers-Dunbar National Historical Park Designation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Wright Brothers-Dunbar National Historical Park Designation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To redesignate the Dayton Aviation Heritage National Historical Park in the State of Ohio as the "Wright Brothers-Dunbar National Historical Park", and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To redesignate Dayton Aviation Heritage National Historic Park in the State of Ohio as "Wright Brothers-Dunbar National Historic Park", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/05/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 4 (Roll no. 91).(text: CR 3/4/2008 H1203)
11/15/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/06/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/05/2008-12:10pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2008-12:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2008-12:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 4 (Roll no. 91). (text: CR 3/4/2008 H1203)
03/05/2008-11:45amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1239-1240)
03/04/2008-2:54pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/04/2008-2:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4191.
03/04/2008-2:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1203-1204)
03/04/2008-2:47pmHouseMr. Rahall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/20/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/15/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
11/15/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources11/15/2007 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands11/20/2007 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/06/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4191. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/05/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Wright Brothers-Dunbar National Historic Park Designation Act - Amends the Dayton Aviation Heritage Preservation Act of 1992 to: (1) rename the Dayton Aviation Heritage National Historical Park as the Wright Brothers-Dunbar National Historic Park; and (2) authorize the Secretary of the Interior to make grants to partners of the Park, including the Aviation Trail, Inc., the Ohio Historical Society, and Dayton History, for projects not requiring federal involvement other than providing financial assistance and which shall be limited to construction and development on non-federal property within the boundaries of the Park for projects that support the purposes of the Park.