Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/29/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/29/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/07/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/07/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/16/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/09/2008