Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 11/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/10/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/16/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/23/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/27/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/06/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/06/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/06/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/12/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/05/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/04/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/11/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/30/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/09/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/24/2008