Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 01/16/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/04/2008