Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/12/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 12/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/17/2007