Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/13/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/26/2008