Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/13/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/18/2007