Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/05/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 12/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/13/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/18/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/18/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/16/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/28/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/06/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/27/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/28/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/10/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/11/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/17/2008