Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/04/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/14/2008