Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/06/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/06/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/05/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/15/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/22/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/30/2008