Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 12/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/18/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/31/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/31/2008