Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 12/05/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/05/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/11/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/15/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/28/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/28/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/06/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 02/13/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/28/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/28/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/12/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/20/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/10/2008