Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008