Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/12/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/13/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/17/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/19/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/03/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/11/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/01/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/03/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/09/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/09/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/14/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/14/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/18/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/01/2008