Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/19/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/08/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/12/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/12/2008