Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/12/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/28/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/29/2008