Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/06/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/12/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/12/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/17/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/22/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/22/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/22/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/22/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/12/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/03/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/03/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/10/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/22/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/04/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/19/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/08/2008