Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/12/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/29/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/08/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/12/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/03/2007