Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/12/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/25/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/05/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 03/05/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/08/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/13/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/09/2008