Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/13/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/13/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/13/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/13/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/17/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/17/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/19/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/19/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/17/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/29/2008