Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 12/12/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 12/12/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/12/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/17/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 12/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/17/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 12/17/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 01/15/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/15/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/15/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/17/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/17/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/17/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/17/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/17/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/23/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/23/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/29/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/12/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/12/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/14/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/14/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/27/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/27/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/02/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/10/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/21/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/20/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/10/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/16/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/25/2008