Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/12/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/12/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/17/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/07/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/20/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/28/2007