Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/12/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/22/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/03/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/03/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/22/2008